Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Sánchez Carrascosa y Carrión, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1823Born
186238.1ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
15 Sep 187551.8SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Sep 187551.8ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
12 Dec 187552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
12 Jan 188258.1ResignedBishop of Ávila, Spain
30 Mar 188258.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
1896¹72.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Sánchez Carrascosa y Carrión
Bishop Pedro José Sánchez Carrascosa y Carrión C.O. (born , died 1896) Bishop Emeritus of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManzanares, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 603
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 43, Number 21
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017