Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabino Catalina y del Amo

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1817Born
1843²25.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 187558.3SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
5 Jul 187558.3ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
24 Oct 187558.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
10 Jan 188264.8DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabino Catalina y del Amo
Bishop Gabino Catalina y del Amo (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudia, Diocese of Sigüenza
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Madrid

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 42, Number 15
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017