Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Oliver y Hurtado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1827Born
21 Apr 186234.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 187548.0SelectedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
23 Sep 187548.1ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
12 Dec 187548.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
3 Sep 188659.0ResignedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
1888¹60.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Oliver y Hurtado
Bishop José Oliver y Hurtado (born , died 1888) Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 436
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 43, Number 22
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017