Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Casas y Souto

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1826Born
1853¹26.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 187548.8SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
23 Sep 187548.9ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
6 Feb 187649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
26 Jul 190679.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Casas y Souto
Bishop Pedro Casas y Souto (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María del Sobrado del Obispo, Diocese of Orense
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 28
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018