Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honorio María de Onaindía y López

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1811Born
23 Jul 187563.5SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
17 Sep 187563.7ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
9 Jan 187664.0Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
27 Dec 188674.9DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Honorio María de Onaindía y López
Bishop Honorio María de Onaindía y López (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgos, Archdiocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 429
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 43, Number 23
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018