Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Alda y Sancho

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1839BornCalmarza
1863¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 188647.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
7 Jun 188647.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
22 Aug 188647.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
1 Jun 188849.2AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
2 Dec 189556.7AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
16 Feb 190161.9DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Alda y Sancho:
Archbishop Vicente Alda y Sancho (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013