Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jaime Cardona y Tur

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Titular Bishop of Sion

Bishop of Spain, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1838Born
1862²23.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189254.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
11 Jul 189254.3AppointedBishop of Spain, Military
30 Nov 189254.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
9 Dec 192082.7AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
4 Jan 192384.8DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Cardona y Tur (VIAF: 87752991)
Patriarch Jaime Cardona y Tur (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbiza
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017