Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Torres y Rivas

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1844BornIbiza
19 Dec 186824.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 190257.5AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
12 Oct 190257.8Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
20 Jan 193994.1DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Torres y Rivas:
Bishop Juan Torres y Rivas (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013