Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Miralles y Sbert

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain

Titular Archbishop of Beroë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1860Born
7 Jun 188423.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 191453.7AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
15 Nov 191454.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lleida, Spain
3 Jul 192564.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
3 Jul 192564.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
14 Apr 192665.5SucceededBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Mar 193069.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
13 Mar 193069.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroë
23 Dec 194787.2DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Miralles y Sbert (VIAF: 13955939)
Archbishop José Miralles y Sbert (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast