Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Perelló y Pou, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1870Born
10 Mar 189423.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192757.1AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
25 Jul 192757.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
14 Aug 192757.2InstalledBishop of Vic, Spain
27 Jul 195585.2DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Perelló y Pou
Bishop Juan Perelló y Pou M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María del Camí

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018