Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Llompart y Jaume Santandreu

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1862Born
13 Dec 188624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
17 May 191855.5AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
15 Sep 191855.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
27 Jun 192259.6AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
30 Apr 192562.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
9 Dec 192866.0DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Llompart y Jaume Santandreu
Bishop Gabriel Llompart y Jaume Santandreu (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInca

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018