Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cartaña y Inglés

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1875Born
17 Sep 189924.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 193358.2AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
22 Apr 193458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
1 Aug 196387.8DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Cartaña y Inglés
Bishop José Cartaña y Inglés (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilavert

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,934, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast