Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Borras y Ferré

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Bisica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1880Born
19 Sep 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 193453.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain
19 Apr 193453.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
22 Jul 193453.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
12 Aug 193655.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Borras y Ferré
Bishop Manuel Borras y Ferré (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Canonja

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast