Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco de Asís Cardinal Vidal y Barraquer

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1868BornCambrils
17 Sep 189930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tarragona, Spain
10 Nov 191345.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solsona, Spain
10 Nov 191345.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
26 Apr 191445.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
7 May 191950.5AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
7 Mar 192152.4Elevated to Cardinal
7 Mar 192152.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
13 Sep 194374.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Asís Vidal y Barraquer:
Francisco de Asís Cardinal Vidal y Barraquer (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015