Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Barberá y Boada

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1847Born
1870¹22.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 190760.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
19 Dec 190760.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
26 Apr 190860.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
28 May 191466.7AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
11 Sep 192477.0DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Barberá y Boada
Bishop Ramón Barberá y Boada (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcover

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 57
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018