Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Ruano Martín

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1840Born
1868²27.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 189858.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
24 Nov 189858.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
16 Apr 189958.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
14 Dec 190565.0AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
8 Jan 191473.1DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Ruano Martín
Bishop Juan Antonio Ruano Martín (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuijuelo del Barro, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Church, Alba de Tormes

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast