Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel María Vidal y Boullon

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1861Born
19 Dec 188523.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 191553.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
25 Feb 191553.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
23 May 191553.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
27 Oct 192361.8AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
26 Jan 192967.0DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel María Vidal y Boullon
Bishop Manuel María Vidal y Boullon (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeira-Rois

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast