Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agustín Cardinal Parrado y García

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1872BornFuensaldaña
21 Sep 189522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
20 May 192552.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
16 Aug 192552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
4 Apr 193461.4AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
18 Feb 194673.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194673.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Oct 194674.0DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Parrado y García:
Agustín Cardinal Parrado y García (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015