Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Casares Hervás

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1917BornValderrubio
21 Sep 194023.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 197052.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
15 May 197052.9Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
12 May 198971.9ResignedBishop of Almería, Spain
24 Jan 199072.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Casares Hervás:
Bishop Manuel Casares Hervás (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Almería

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013