Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Roca Cabanellas

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1921BornPalma de Mallorca
31 May 194726.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 196645.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Jul 196645.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigimma
2 Oct 196645.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigimma
22 Apr 196948.0SucceededBishop of Cartagena (en España)
25 May 197857.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Jan 199270.7DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Roca Cabanellas:
Archbishop Miguel Roca Cabanellas (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014