Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ricote Alonso

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1905Born
30 May 193125.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 195145.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
19 Feb 195145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
20 May 195145.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
23 Jan 196559.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
8 Dec 196863.4SucceededBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
8 Oct 197267.3DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ricote Alonso
Bishop Juan Ricote Alonso (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Toba

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 May 2017