Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María García Lahiguera

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1903Born
29 May 192623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
17 May 195047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
17 May 195047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
29 Oct 195047.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
7 Jul 196461.3AppointedBishop of Huelva, Spain
1 Jul 196966.3AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
25 May 197875.2RetiredArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
14 Jul 198986.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María García Lahiguera
Archbishop José María García Lahiguera (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFitero

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017