Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Eijo y Garay

Deceased

Bishop of Madrid

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1878BornVigo
27 Dec 190022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tui, Spain
28 May 191436.1AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
8 Nov 191436.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
22 Mar 191738.9AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
29 Jun 191739.2InstalledBishop of Vitoria, Spain
14 Dec 192244.7AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
8 Jul 192345.2InstalledBishop of Madrid, Spain
21 Jul 194668.3AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
31 Aug 196385.4DiedBishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Eijo y Garay:
Bishop Leopoldo Eijo y Garay (born , died ) Bishop of Madrid

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013