Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Pascual Miguel y Martínez, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1870Born
17 Dec 189222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Dec 192454.6AppointedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
18 Dec 192454.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
26 Jul 192555.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
5 May 192656.0DiedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pascual Miguel y Martínez
Bishop Pedro Pascual Miguel y Martínez O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaquirán de la Puebla, Spain

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018