Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albino González y Menédez Reigada, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1881BornCorias
15 Mar 190524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Dec 192443.9AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
19 Jul 192544.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
18 Feb 194665.0AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
13 Aug 195877.5DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Albino González y Menédez Reigada:
Bishop Albino González y Menédez Reigada O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015