Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Martínez y Noval, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1868Born
18 Jul 188517.3ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
24 Sep 189224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
18 Jul 192153.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
30 Nov 192153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
30 Dec 192153.8InstalledBishop of Almería, Spain
24 Jun 193466.3DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Martínez y Noval
Bishop Bernardo Martínez y Noval O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdesoto

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 88
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 48
  • bd/d: CB, 19 Jul 2014
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018