Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Prudencio Melo y Alcalde

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1860BornBurgos
21 Sep 188323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
19 Dec 190747.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
19 Dec 190747.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
29 Mar 190847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
18 Jul 191353.2AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
7 Dec 191353.6InstalledBishop of Vitoria, Spain
4 Dec 191656.6AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
22 Apr 191757.0InstalledBishop of Madrid, Spain
14 Dec 192262.6AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Jun 192363.1InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
31 Oct 194585.5DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Prudencio Melo y Alcalde:
Archbishop Prudencio Melo y Alcalde (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014