Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javer Lauzurica y Torralba

Deceased

Archbishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1890BornYurrieta
2 Jun 191726.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 193140.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
20 Feb 193140.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Siniandus
26 Apr 193140.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siniandus
10 Jun 194352.5AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
8 Apr 194958.3AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 Oct 195463.9AppointedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain
12 Apr 196473.4DiedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javer Lauzurica y Torralba:
Archbishop Francisco Javer Lauzurica y Torralba (born , died ) Archbishop of Oviedo

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013