Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Hervás y Benet

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Ciudad Real

Titular Bishop of Alinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1905BornPuzol
17 Jun 192923.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 194438.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
13 Jan 194438.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
23 Apr 194438.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
26 Oct 194640.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mallorca, Spain
22 Dec 194742.1SucceededBishop of Mallorca, Spain
14 Mar 195549.3AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
14 Mar 195549.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
30 Sep 197670.8ResignedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
30 Sep 197670.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
6 Jun 198276.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Hervás y Benet:
Bishop Juan Hervás y Benet (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Ciudad Real

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013