Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Llopis Ivorra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coria-Cáceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1902BornAlcoy
18 Nov 192826.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 195048.0AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
30 Apr 195048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
16 Mar 197775.2RetiredBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
1 May 198179.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Coria-Cáceres, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Llopis Ivorra:
Bishop Manuel Llopis Ivorra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coria-Cáceres

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013