Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Domínguez Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1931Born
18 Dec 195423.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 197745.4AppointedBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
24 Apr 197745.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
26 Oct 199059.0DiedBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Domínguez Gómez
Bishop Jesús Domínguez Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Coria-Cáceres

EventPlace
Birth PlacePilas
Ordained BishopNuestra Senora de Guadalupe, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast