Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicente Cardinal Enrique y Tarancón

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1907BornBurriana
1 Nov 192922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tortosa, Spain
25 Nov 194538.5AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
24 Mar 194638.9Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
12 Apr 196456.9AppointedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 Jan 196961.7AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Apr 196962.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196962.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto
3 Dec 197164.6AppointedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
12 Apr 198375.9RetiredArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
28 Nov 199487.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Enrique y Tarancón:
Vicente Cardinal Enrique y Tarancón (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
  • a cardinal for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014