Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Pont y Gol

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1907Born
22 Mar 193123.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 195144.3AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
30 Nov 195144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
23 Nov 197063.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
11 Apr 198376.0RetiredArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
4 Oct 199588.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Pont y Gol
Archbishop José Pont y Gol (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellpuig

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,951, Number 113
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,995, Page 682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast