Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Iglesias Navarri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1889BornDurro
14 Jul 191223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Urgell, Spain
29 Dec 194253.9AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
4 Apr 194354.1Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
29 Apr 196980.2RetiredBishop of Urgell, Spain
29 Apr 196980.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Satrianum
11 Dec 197081.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Satrianum
31 Mar 197283.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Iglesias Navarri:
Bishop Ramón Iglesias Navarri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Urgell

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015