Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Moll y Salord

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortosa

Titular Bishop of Urbs Salvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1897BornCiudadela
19 Mar 192023.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 193639.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tortosa, Spain
25 Jun 193639.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
30 May 193740.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
18 Nov 194346.6SucceededBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Oct 196871.5ResignedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Oct 196871.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Urbs Salvia
23 Mar 197275.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Moll y Salord:
Bishop Manuel Moll y Salord (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortosa

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1973
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015