Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio María Cardinal Javierre Ortas, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1921BornSiétamo, Spain
24 Apr 194928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 May 197655.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
20 May 197655.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
29 Jun 197655.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meta
28 Jun 198867.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198867.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
1 Jul 198867.4AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
1 Jul 198867.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
Dec 199170.8ResignedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
Dec 199170.8ResignedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
24 Jan 199270.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
21 Jun 199675.3RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
9 Jan 199977.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
20 Apr 199978.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
1 Feb 200785.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Javierre Ortas:
Antonio María Cardinal Javierre Ortas S.D.B. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • i: Bollettino, 20 Apr 1999
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 11 Feb 2014