Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joan Enric Vives Sicilia

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1949 BornBarcelona
24 Sep 197425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199343.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199343.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nona
5 Sep 199344.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nona
25 Jun 200151.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Urgell, Spain
12 May 200353.8SucceededBishop of Urgell, Spain
19 Mar 201060.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joan Enric Vives Sicilia:
Archbishop Joan Enric Vives Sicilia (born ) Bishop of Urgell

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Urgell.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,132
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015