Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Osés Flamarique

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1926Born
19 Mar 195023.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 196943.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huesca, Spain
10 Nov 196943.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
8 Dec 196943.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula
28 Feb 197750.5AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
24 Aug 200175.0RetiredBishop of Huesca, Spain
22 Oct 200175.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Javier Osés Flamarique
Bishop Javier Osés Flamarique (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTafalla

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018