Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pere Tena Garriga

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Pumentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1928Born
29 Jul 195123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199365.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199365.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pumentum
5 Sep 199365.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pumentum
15 Jun 200476.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
10 Feb 201485.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pere Tena Garriga
Bishop Pere Tena Garriga (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHospitalet de llobregat

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018