Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramiro Moliner Inglés

Apostolic Nuncio to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Sarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1941 BornCastelserás, Spain
19 Mar 196524.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 199351.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sarda
2 Jan 199351.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
2 Jan 199351.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
22 Feb 199351.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sarda
10 May 199756.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
17 Jan 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia
17 Jan 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Djibouti
17 Jan 200462.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
26 Jul 200867.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Albania

MicroData Summary for Ramiro Moliner Inglés:
Archbishop Ramiro Moliner Inglés (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Albania

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Albania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,057
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014