Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Mejía Saldarriaga, S.J.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Vulturia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1938 Born
13 Dec 196931.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Jan 200768.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia
5 Jan 200768.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturia
4 Mar 200768.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturia
20 Jan 201071.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Soddo, Ethiopia
12 Jan 201475.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Soddo, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Mejía Saldarriaga
Bishop Rodrigo Mejía Saldarriaga S.J. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellin, Colombia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,343
  • r: CB, 12 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 May 2017