Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Woldeghiorghis Matheos

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hosanna, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Turuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1940 Born
4 May 196928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Hosanna, Ethiopia
20 Jan 201069.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hosanna, Ethiopia
20 Jan 201069.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuda
11 Apr 201069.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuda
8 Apr 201776.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Hosanna, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Woldeghiorghis Matheos
Bishop Woldeghiorghis Matheos (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hosanna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWagabeta, Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Hosanna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,621
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017
  • ln/bp: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017