Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo

Vicariatus Apostolicus Soddensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Tsegaye Keneni Derara, Vicar Apostolic
  • Rodrigo Mejía Saldarriaga, S.J., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus
  • Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi, O.F.M. Cap., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Split: 20 January 2010
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 46,786 (18,071 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 132, Wolayta Soddo, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (046)551.20.61
  • Fax: 551.20.63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna
13 February 1940ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Gimma
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli
Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
30 December 1977Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Hosanna Prefecture Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
15 October 1982ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
20 January 2010SplitVicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna Vicariate Apostolic of Hosanna
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo
20 January 2010SplitVicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna Vicariate Apostolic of Hosanna
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna
19507,000441,75032ap1951
197018,000960,0001.9%114151,200156ap1971
Prefecture Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
198035,8032,304,0001.6%126271,326292811ap1981
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna
199065,6623,198,0002.1%126272,4311274913ap1991
1999142,3394,264,0003.3%1431453,1631345117ap2000
2000155,0236,200,0002.5%1933522,9811364718ap2001
2001161,4076,400,0002.5%2332552,9341445027ap2002
2002167,3746,700,0002.5%2333562,9881465428ap2003
2003183,9026,700,0002.7%2430543,4051415328ap2004
2004198,8276,900,0002.9%2327503,976386728ap2005
2009250,0007,700,0003.2%5421753,333417859bul20Jan2010
Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo
2010128,5394,840,1822.7%2221432,9891254721ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014