Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte

Vicariatus Apostolicus Nekemteensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 3 September 1982
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 98,792 (38,158 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 12, Nekemte, Ethiopia; P.O. Box 5934, Addis Abeba, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (057)661.13.58; (011)279.24.27
  • Fax: 661.36.60; 279.26.59

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Kaffa {Kaffa Meridionale}
28 January 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Galla Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Kaffa {Kaffa Meridionale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaffa
8 September 1913Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Southern Kaffa {Kaffa Meridionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kaffa
25 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Galla
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaffa
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Gimma
25 March 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaffa Vicariate Apostolic of Gimma
13 February 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Gimma
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli
Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna (erected)
13 February 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Gimma Prefecture Apostolic of Endeber (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte
3 September 1982Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Gimma Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte
10 June 1994Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nekemte Prefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Gimma
19508,000881,000215ap1951
19707,345427,0001.7%22223332417ap1971
198013,0005,111,000.3%32831419284339ap1981
Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte
199022,7246,394,000.4%52025908375132ap1991
199926,5944,780,000.6%89171,56492351ap2000
200026,0516,000,000.4%1310231,132102953ap2001
200127,0956,000,000.5%1411251,083113266ap2002
200231,2526,000,000.5%231235892123870ap2003
200332,6276,000,000.5%2693593293871ap2004
200442,0006,000,000.7%2710371,135193871ap2005
201048,3957,050,000.7%2410341,423204587ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 28 Nov 2014