Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Janssen, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gimma, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Coeliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1912Born
23 Jul 193926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 May 195946.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gimma, Ethiopia
21 May 195946.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
31 Jul 195946.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana
4 Jul 197259.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gimma, Ethiopia
18 Dec 198775.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gimma, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Franz Janssen
Bishop Franz Janssen C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gimma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoschkapele

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,959, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast