Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter Jan Antoon Moors

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

Titular Bishop of Traiectum ad Mosam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1906BornWeert
5 Apr 193023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
26 Jan 195952.4AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
17 Mar 195952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
29 Dec 197064.3ResignedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
29 Dec 197064.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
16 Sep 198074.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Pieter Jan Antoon Moors:
Bishop Pieter Jan Antoon Moors (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013