Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik Hubert Frehen, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Reykjavik, Iceland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1917Born
18 Dec 194326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
18 Oct 196851.7AppointedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
8 Dec 196851.8Ordained BishopBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
19 Dec 196851.9InstalledBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
31 Oct 198669.7DiedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland

MicroData Summary for Hendrik Hubert Frehen
Bishop Hendrik Hubert Frehen S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Reykjavik

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaubach, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands
Ordained BishopChurch, Waubach, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands
Death PlaceReykjavik, Diocese of Reykjavik

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 286
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast