Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Reykjavik

Dioecesis Reykiavikensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre Bürcher, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 October 1968
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Iceland
  • Square Kilometers: 103,000 (39,783 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholica.is/
  • Mailing Address: Biskupsstofa, P.B. 490, Havallagata 14, IS-121 Reykjavik, Island
  • Telephone: 552.53.88
  • Fax: 562.38.78

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
12 June 1923ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
6 June 1929ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda} Vicariate Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
Diocese of Reykjavik
18 October 1968ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda} Diocese of Reykjavik

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
1950443140,000.3%167633592ap1951
Diocese of Reykjavik
19701,327203,600.7%2791477592ap1971
19801,571226,339.7%3691746502ap1981
19902,367253,482.9%84121974504ap1991
19993,513275,2771.3%75122925354ap2000
20003,827278,7021.4%66123186394ap2001
20014,307282,8451.5%66123586354ap2002
20025,200288,2011.8%64105204364ap2003
20035,211288,2011.8%65114735364ap2004
20045,582290,4901.9%65115075344ap2005
20109,625317,5933.0%5111660111325ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 24 Jun 2013