Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist Hubert Theunissen, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Blantyre

Titular Archbishop of Skálholt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1905BornSchimmert
1 Dec 192924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
25 Dec 194944.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shiré, Malawi
25 Dec 194944.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
25 Mar 195044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
25 Apr 195953.5AppointedArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
14 Oct 196762.0ResignedArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
14 Oct 196762.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bavagaliana
19 Dec 196863.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Skálholt
9 Apr 197973.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Blantyre, Malawi

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Hubert Theunissen:
Archbishop John Baptist Hubert Theunissen S.M.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Blantyre

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015