Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Chitsulo

Deceased

Bishop of Dedza, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1909Born
5 Sep 193727.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 195646.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dedza, Malawi
9 Nov 195646.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonitza
11 May 195747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonitza
25 Apr 195949.3AppointedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
28 Feb 198474.1DiedBishop of Dedza, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Chitsulo
Bishop Cornelius Chitsulo (born , died ) Bishop of Dedza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMua
Ordained BishopLilongwe, Vicariate Apostolic of Likuni

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast